No. 20-1680 | |
Title: | ACI Information Group, Petitioner v. MidlevelU, Inc. |
Docketed: | June 3, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-10856) |
Decision Date: | March 3, 2021 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 28 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 6, 2021) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Jun 03 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Midlevelu, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jun 04 2021 | Supplemental brief of petitioner ACI Information Group filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 08 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021. |
Jun 28 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Kip David Nelson Counsel of Record | Fox Rothschild LLP 230 N. Elm Street Suite 1200 Greensboro, NC 27401 knelson@foxrothschild.com | 336.378.5206 |
Party name: ACI Information Group | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Andrew Archer Warth Counsel of Record | Waller Landsen Dortch & Davis 511 Union Street Suite 2700 Nashville, TN 37219 drew.warth@wallerlaw.com | 6158508874 |
Party name: Midlevelu, Inc. |