No. 20-1678
Vide 20-1520
Title:Daniel Z. Crowe, et al., Petitioners
v.
Oregon State Bar, et al.
Docketed:June 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-35463)
   Decision Date:February 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Daniel Crowe, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 03 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Oregon State Bar, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jun 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Lawyers United Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 24 2021Waiver of Oregon State Bar, et al. of right to respond submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jacob H. Huebert
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater institute
500 E. Coronado Rd.
Phoenix, AZ 85004

jhuebert@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Daniel Crowe, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Steven M. Wilker
    Counsel of Record
Tonkon Torp LLP
888 SW Fifth Avenue
Suite 1600
Portland, OR 97204

steven.wilker@tonkon.com
5038022040
Party name: Oregon State Bar, et al.
Other
Joseph Robert Giannini
    Counsel of Record
Joseph Robert Giannini
12016 Wilshire Blvd #5
#5
Los Angeles, CA 90025

j.r.giannini@verizon.net
3108041814
Party name: Lawyers United Inc.