No. 20-1673
Title:Ashley Nettles, Petitioner
v.
Midland Funding LLC, et al.
Docketed:June 2, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3327)
   Decision Date:December 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 2, 2021 to August 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 2, 2021.
Aug 02 2021Brief of respondents Midland Funding LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 18 2021Reply of petitioner Ashley Nettles filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Ashley Nettles
Attorneys for Respondents
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Midland Funding LLC, et al.