No. 20-1668
Title:City of Tahlequah, Oklahoma, et al., Petitioners
v.
Austin P. Bond, as Special Administrator of the Estate of Dominic F. Rollice, Deceased
Docketed:June 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-7056)
   Decision Date:December 1, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 1, 2021 to July 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 17 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by National Sheriffs' Association.
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 15, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: City of Tahlequah, Oklahoma, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: Austin P. Bond
Other
Gregory Charles Champagne
    Counsel of Record
St. Charles Parish Sheriff's Office
260 Judge Edward Dufresne Parkway
Luling, LA 70070

SheriffGC@stcharlessheriff.org
985-783-0204
Party name: National Sheriffs' Association