No. 20-1650
Title:Carlos Concepcion, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2025)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 25, 2021 to July 26, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 26, 2021.
Jul 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2021 to August 25, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 25, 2021.
Aug 25 2021Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 09 2021Reply of petitioner Carlos Concepcion filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 30 2021Petition GRANTED.
Oct 22 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Carlos Concepcion.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 01 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Nov 15 2021Brief of petitioner Carlos Concepcion filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, January 19, 2022.
Nov 17 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Drug Policy Alliance and The Law Enforcement Action Partnership filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of FAMM, The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, and the National Association of Federal Defenders filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of The Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic; A New Way of Life Reentry Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Dr. Karen Swanson, Dr. Byron R. Johnson, and Dr. Sung Joon Jang filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Due Process Institute, American Civil Liberties Union, ACLU of Massachusetts, and Southern Poverty Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Conservative Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of The District of Columbia, et al., filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Criminal Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2021The record from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Dec 06 2021The record from the U.S.D.C. Dist. of Massachusetts is electronic and located on Pacer, the Sealed Appendix is filed electronically.
Dec 14 2021CIRCULATED
Dec 15 2021Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 07 2022Reply of petitioner Carlos Concepcion filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2022Argued. For petitioner: Charles L. McCloud, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Matthew Guarnieri, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Charles Luther McCloud
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

lmccloud@wc.com
202-434-5586
Party name: Carlos Concepcion
Lisa Schiavo BlattWilliams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Carlos Concepcion
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Caroline Sage Van Zile
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General for D.C.
Office of the Solicitor General
400 6th Street, NW, Suite 8100
Washington, DC 20001

caroline.vanzile@dc.gov
(202) 724-6609
Party name: The District of Columbia, et al.,
Bradley N. Garcia
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
1625 Eye St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bgarcia@omm.com
202-383-5160
Party name: Due Process Institute, American Civil Liberties Union, ACLU of Massachusetts, and Southern Poverty Law Center
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

vlevy@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5151
Party name: Drug Policy Alliance and The Law Enforcement Action Partnership
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 2062
Arlington, VA 22202

john@johnmasslon.com
(703) 791-9483
Party name: American Conservative Union Foundation
Joshua Craig McDaniel
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School Religious Freedom Clinic
1585 Massachusetts Ave.
Cambridge, MA 02138

jmcdaniel@law.harvard.edu
6179981593
Party name: Dr. Karen Swanson, Dr. Byron R. Johnson, and Dr. Sung Joon Jang
Michael David Pepson
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Rd., Ste. 700
Arlington, VA 22201

mpepson@afphq.org
5713294529
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: FAMM, The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, and the National Association of Federal Defenders
Dawinder Singh Sidhu
    Counsel of Record
Hopwood & Singhal, PLLC
1701 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

sidhu@hopwoodsinghal.com
202-662-9559
Party name: Criminal Law Scholars
Tiffany Regina Wright
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law Human and Civil Rights Clinic
2900 Van Ness Street NW
Washington, DC 20008

tiffany.wright@orrick.com
202-643-7204
Party name: The Howard University School of Law Civil Rights Clinic; A New Way of Life Reentry Project