No. 20-1648
Title:James H. Fischer, Petitioner
v.
Sandra F. Forrest, et al.
Docketed:May 26, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-2955, 18-2959)
   Decision Date:August 4, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 15, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Information Dignity Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 02 2021Response Requested. (Due September 1, 2021)
Aug 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 1, 2021 to October 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 1, 2021.
Oct 01 2021Brief of respondents Sandra F. Forrest, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Benedict Grimm
    Counsel of Record
Digital Justice Foundation
15287 Pepperwood Drive
Omaha, NE 68154

andrew@digitaljusticefoundation.org
(531) 210-2381
Party name: James H. Fischer
Attorneys for Respondents
Daniel Kenneth Cahn
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Cahn & Cahn, P.C.
105 Maxess Road, Suite 124
Melville, NY 11747

dcahn@cahnlaw.com
6318355278
Party name: Sandra F. Forrest, et al.
Daniel Kenneth CahnLaw Offices of Cahn & Cahn
105 Maxess Road, Suite 124
Melville, NY 11747

dcahn@cahnlaw.com
631-752-1600
Party name: Sandra F. Forrest, et al.
Other
Edward Francis Cunningham
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Edward F. Cunningham
62 Cambridge Avenue
Garden City, NY 11530

ed@edcunninghamlaw.com
516 328 3705
Party name: Information Dignity Alliance