No. 20-1641
Title:Marietta Memorial Hospital Employee Health Benefit Plan, et al., Petitioners
v.
Davita Inc., et al.
Docketed:May 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-4039)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 23, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2021Waiver of right of respondent Davita Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 21 2021Response Requested. (Due August 20, 2021)
Aug 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 20, 2021 to September 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 20, 2021.
Sep 20 2021Brief of respondents Davita Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 04 2021Reply of petitioners Marietta Memorial Hospital Employee Health Benefit Plan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 05 2021Petition GRANTED.
Dec 17 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, March 1, 2022.
Dec 20 2021Brief of petitioners Marietta Memorial Hospital Employee Health Benefit Plan, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Dec 22 2021Brief amici curiae of Pacific Health Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Self-Insurance Institute of America, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2021The record received from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit has been electronically filed.
Jan 18 2022CIRCULATED
Jan 19 2022Brief of respondents Davita Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 26 2022Amicus brief of Dialysis Patient Citizens submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Amicus brief of Congressman William Thomas submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Amicus brief of Thomas A. Scully submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 26 2022Amicus brief of Kidney Care Council and Renal Healthcare Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Amicus brief of National Association for the Advancement of Colored People submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 26 2022Amicus brief of Kidney Care Partners submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John J. Kulewicz
    Counsel of Record
Vorys, Sater, et al.
52 East Gay Street
P.O. Box 1008
Columbus, OH 43216-1008

jjkulewicz@vorys.com
6144645634
Party name: Marietta Memorial Hospital Employee Health Benefit Plan, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Davita Inc., et al.
Jeffrey S. BucholtzKing & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

jbucholtz@kslaw.com
202-626-2907
Party name: Davita Inc., et al.
Matthew M. LeLandKing & Spalding, LLP
1700 Pennsylavia Avenue, N.W., Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

mleland@kslaw.com
202-626-5527
Party name: Davita Inc., et al.
Other
James Forrest Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Dowd Bennett LLP
7733 Forsyth
Suite 1900
Clayton, MO 63105

jbennett@dowdbennett.com
3148897300
Party name: Thomas A. Scully
Michael Evan Bern
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 11th Street NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004-1304

michael.bern@lw.com
202-637-1021
Party name: Kidney Care Council and Renal Healthcare Association
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Kidney Care Partners
Nicholas J. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
90 S. 7th Street, Suite 2200
Suite 470
Minneapolis, MN 55402-3901

nicholas.nelson@faegredrinker.com
(612) 766-7205
Party name: Dialysis Patient Citizens
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: National Association for the Advancement of Colored People
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe
Suite 3900
Chicago,, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
608-999-1240
Party name: Congressman William Thomas
John Robert Christiansen
    Counsel of Record
Christiansen IT Law
2103 Harrison Ave. NW, Suite 2
PMB-885
Olympia, WA 98502

john@christiansenlaw.net
(360) 915-9895
Party name: Pacific Health Coalition
Christopher Jay Walker
    Counsel of Record
The Ohio State University Moritz College of Law
55 West 12th Avenue
Columbus, OH 43210-1391

christopher.j.walker@gmail.com
614-247-1898
Party name: Self-Insurance Institute of America, Inc.