No. 20-1631 | |
Title: | Drew Hirshfeld, Acting Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office, Petitioner v. Implicit, LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | May 21, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2020-1173, 2020-1174) |
Decision Date: | December 23, 2020 Rule 12.4 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 21 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 21, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Jun 21 2021 | Brief of respondent Apple Inc. in support filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther | |
Jul 14 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021. |
Aug 11 2021 | Response Requested. (Due September 10, 2021) |
Sep 10 2021 | Response from respondents Implicit, LLC, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Sep 29 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021. |
Oct 18 2021 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of United States v. Arthrex, Inc., 594 U. S. ___ (2021). |
Nov 19 2021 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Brian H. Fletcher Counsel of Record | Acting Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Andrew, Acting Under Secretary of Commercie for Intellectual Property and Director, US Patent and Trade Office Hirshfeld | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Debra J. McComas Counsel of Record | Haynes & Boone, LLP 2323 Victory Avenue Suite 700 Dallas, TX 75219 debbie.mccomas@haynesboone.com | 214-651-5375 |
Party name: Apple Inc. | ||
John Derek McCorquindale Counsel of Record | Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP 1875 Explorer Street, Suite 800 Reston, VA 20190 derek.mccorquindale@finnegan.com | 571-203-2768 |
Party name: Implicit, LLC, et al. |