No. 20-1614
Title:John D. Leontaritis, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19- 40498)
   Decision Date:October 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 16, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 07 2021Response Requested. (Due July 7, 2021)
Jun 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 7, 2021 to August 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2021.
Jul 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 6, 2021 to September 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 7, 2021.
Sep 07 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Charles Randall Flores
    Counsel of Record
Beck Redden LLP
1221 McKinney St.
Suite 4500
Houston, TX 77010

cflores@beckredden.com
713-951-6268
Party name: John Leontaritis
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America