No. 20-1611
Title:Healthcare Distribution Alliance, et al., Petitioners
v.
Letitia James, Attorney General of New York, et al.
Docketed:May 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-199, 19-183, 19-201)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 20, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 18, 2021 to July 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 19, 2021.
Jun 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 19 2021Brief of respondents Letitia James et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2021Reply of petitioners Healthcare Distribution Alliance, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
500 North Capitol Street NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

mkimberly@mwe.com
(202) 756-8901
Party name: Healthcare Distribution Alliance, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: Letitia James et al.
Steven Chiajon WuNew York Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005

steven.wu@ag.ny.gov
2124166312
Party name: Letitia James et al.
Other
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#650
Washington, DC 20001

jdhenchman@gmail.com
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Jacob Moshe Roth
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

yroth@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America