No. 20-161
Title:City of Sacramento, California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Robert Mann, Sr., et al.
Docketed:August 14, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-15483)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:June 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 27 2020Waiver of right of respondent Robert Mann, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Sep 08 2020Response Requested. (Due October 8, 2020)
Sep 18 2020Brief of Robert Mann, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John A. Whitesides
    Counsel of Record
Angelo, Kilday & Kilduff, LLP
601 University Ave., Suite 150
Sacramento, CA 95825

jwhitesides@akk-law.com
(916) 564-6100
Party name: City of Sacramento, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Edwin Merin
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Mark E. Merin
1010 F Street
Suite 300
Sacramento, CA 95814

mark@markmerin.com
(916) 443-6911
Party name: Robert Mann, et al.