No. 20-1598
Title:Project Veritas Action Fund, Petitioner
v.
Rachael S. Rollins, in Her Official Capacity as District Attorney for Suffolk County, Massachusetts
Docketed:May 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1586, 19-1640)
   Decision Date:December 15, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Project Veritas Action Fund
Blanket Consent
Jun 11 2021Waiver of right of respondent Rachael Rollins to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 15 2021Amicus brief of Thomas More Society not accepted for filing. (Dupilicate submission)(June 17, 2021)
Jun 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jun 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2021Brief amici curiae of Accuracy in Media, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Protect the 1st, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 06 2021Response Requested. (Due August 5, 2021)
Jul 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2021 to October 4, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 4, 2021.
Sep 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 4, 2021 to October 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 15, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Barr
    Counsel of Record
Barr & Klein PLLC
444 N. Michigan Avenue
Suite 1200
Chicago, IL 60611

ben@barrklein.com
2025954671
Party name: Project Veritas Action Fund
Attorneys for Respondent
Eric Andrew Haskell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

eric.haskell@mass.gov
617-963-2855
Party name: Rachael Rollins
Other
Dan Backer
    Counsel of Record
Chalmers & Adams LLC
441 North Lee Street, Suite 300
Alexandria, VA 22314

dbacker@chalmersadams.com
2022105431
Party name: Accuracy in Media
Timothy Belz
    Counsel of Record
Clayton Plaza Law Group, LC
112 South Hanley
Suite 200
St. Louis, MO 63105

tbelz@olblaw.com
3142839772
Party name: Thomas More Society
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect the 1st, Inc.