No. 20-1596
Title:Taylor Lohmeyer Law Firm P.L.L.C., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50506)
   Decision Date:April 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 14, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 16, 2021 to July 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 16, 2021.
Jun 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 16, 2021 to August 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 16, 2021.
Aug 16 2021Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 31 2021Reply of petitioner Taylor Lohmeyer Law Firm PLLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Jon Knight
    Counsel of Record
Chamberlain, Hrdlicka,White, Williams & Aughtry, PC
1200 Smith Street
Suite 1400
Houston, TX 77002

steven.knight@chamberlainlaw.com
713-658-1818
Party name: Taylor Lohmeyer Law Firm PLLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Lawrence Michael Hill
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

lhill@steptoe.com
212 506-3934
Party name: American College of Tax Counsel
Steven Richard ToscherHochman Salkin Toscher Perez, P.C.
9150 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 300
Beverly Hills, CA 90212

toscher@taxlitigator.com
310-281-3200
Party name: American College of Tax Counsel