No. 20-1594
Title:Murray Rojas, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 18, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2056)
   Decision Date:January 11, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:February 12, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 17, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 17, 2021 to July 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 19, 2021.
Jun 17 2021Brief amici curiae of American Conservative Union Foundation and The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 19, 2021 to August 18, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 18, 2021.
Aug 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 18, 2021 to September 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 17, 2021.
Sep 17 2021Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 06 2021Reply of petitioner Murray Rojas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Murray Rojas
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Thomas Michael Johnson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wiley Rein LLP
1776 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

tmjohnson@wiley.law
(202) 719-7000
Party name: American Conservative Union Foundation and The Cato Institute