No. 20-1587
Title:Louisiana, Petitioner
v.
Tazin Ardell Hill
Docketed:May 14, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Louisiana
   Case Numbers:(2020-KA-00323)
   Decision Date:October 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 9, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 14, 2021 to July 14, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 14, 2021.
Jun 14 2021Brief amici curiae of State of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 14, 2021 to August 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 11, 2021 (twenty-eight day extension).
Aug 11 2021Brief of respondent Tazin Ardell Hill in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 11 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Tazin A. Hill.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Aug 25 2021Reply of petitioner Louisiana filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth Baker Murrill
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1885 N. Third Street
Baton Rouge, LA 70802

murrille@ag.louisiana.gov
225-326-6766
Party name: Louisiana
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard John Bourke
    Counsel of Record
Louisiana Capital Assistance Center
636 Baronne Street
New Orleans, LA 70113

rbourke@thejusticecenter.org
5042582915
Party name: Tazin Ardell Hill
Other
Bryan Gregg Cleveland
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General's Office
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

bryan.cleveland@oag.ok.gov
(405) 522-1961
Party name: State of Oklahoma, et al.