No. 20-1573
Title:Viking River Cruises, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Angie Moriana
Docketed:May 13, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B297327)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:December 9, 2020
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 14, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jun 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of California New Car Dealers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Restaurant Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 13 2021Response Requested. (Due August 12, 2021)
Aug 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2021 to September 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 10, 2021.
Sep 10 2021Brief of respondent Angie Moriana in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Reply of petitioner Viking River Cruises, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Dec 15 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jan 04 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Blanket Consent
Jan 13 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Angie Moriana
Blanket Consent
Jan 28 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, March 30, 2022.
Jan 31 2022Brief of petitioner Viking River Cruises, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed)
Main Document
Feb 01 2022Record requested from the U.S. Court of Appeal of California 2nd Appellate.
Feb 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of California New Car Dealers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation and Atlantic Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Employers Group filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Uber Technologies, Inc. and Postmates, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and the National Retail Federation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of California Employment Law Council filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Civil Justice Association of California filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of Restaurant Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of The California Business and Industrial Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 11 2022CIRCULATED
Feb 14 2022The record received from the Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles has been electronically filed.
Mar 02 2022Brief of respondent Angie Moriana filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2022Amicus brief of National Academy of Arbitrators not accepted for filing. (March 08, 2022 -- Corrected version to be submitted)
Mar 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Academy of Arbitrators filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2022Brief amicus curiae of Steve Chow filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of The American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amici curiae of California Rural Legal Assistance, Inc. and California Rural Legal Assistance Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amici curiae of Civil Procedure and Arbitration Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amici curiae of California Employment Lawyers’ Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of State of California filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Arbitration Scholar Imre Stephen Szalai filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of Tracy Chen, in Her Representative Proxy Capacity on Behalf of the State of California filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2022Reply of petitioner Viking River Cruises, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 29 2022Record received from the Courtof Appeal of the State of California Second Appellate District Division 3. (1 Box)
Mar 30 2022Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Scott L. Nelson, Washington, D. C.
Jun 15 2022Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Breyer, Sotomayor, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined, in which Roberts, C. J., joined as to Parts I and III, and in which Kavanaugh and Barrett, JJ., joined as to Part III. Sotomayor, J., filed a concurring opinion. Barrett, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and concurring in the judgment, in which Kavanaugh, J., joined, and in which Roberts, C. J, joined as to all but the footnote. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
Jul 06 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2022DISTRIBUTED.
Aug 22 2022Rehearing DENIED.
Aug 22 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kevin T. Barnes
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Kevin T. Barnes
1635 Pontius Avenue, Second Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90025-3361

barnes@kbarnes.com
323-302-9675
Party name: Angie Moriana
Other
Christopher D. Baker
    Counsel of Record
Baker Curtis & Schwartz, P.C.
1 California Street, Suite 1250
San Francisco, CA 94111

cbaker@bakerlp.com
4154331064
Party name: Steve Chow
Peder K. Batalden
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz & Levy LLP
3601 W. Olive Ave.
8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505

pbatalden@horvitzlevy.com
818-995-0800
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Harold Craig Becker
    Counsel of Record
815 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

cbecker@aflcio.org
202-637-5310
Party name: The American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Jonathan Andrew Berry
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray & Associates
801 17th St. NW Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

berry@boydengrayassociates.com
2028095613
Party name: The California Business and Industrial Alliance
Eric F. CitronGoldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Matthew William Finkin
    Counsel of Record
University of Illinois College of Law
504 East Pennsylvania Avenue
Champaign, IL 61820

mfinkin@illinois.edu
2173333884
Party name: National Academy of Arbitrators
Gary B. Friedman
    Counsel of Record
Friedman Law Group LLP
5 White Street
New York, NY 10013

gfriedman@flgllp.com
917-568-5024
Party name: Law Professors of Civil Procedure and Arbitration
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc. and the National Retail Federation
Fred J. Hiestand
    Counsel of Record
Fred J. Hiestand, A Professional Corporation
3418 3rd Avenue, Suite 1
Sacramento, CA 95817

fred@fjh-law.com
9164485100
Party name: Civil Justice Association of California
Mark Francis Humenik
    Counsel of Record
Polk Kabat, LLP
423 South Estate Drive
Orange, CA 92869

mhumenik@polkkabat.com
(949) 636-5754
Party name: Tracy Chen, in Her Representative Proxy Capacity on Behalf of the State of California
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
(213) 229-7804
Party name: Uber Technologies, Inc. and Postmates, LLC
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: California New Car Dealers Association
Colette Gianna Matzzie
    Counsel of Record
Phillips & Cohen LLP
2000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

cmatzzie@phillipsandcohen.com
(202) 833-4567
Party name: Taxpayers Against Fraud Education Fund
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: Employers Group
Ellen Louise Noble
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
1620 L St . NW Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

enoble@publicjustice.net
2406203645
Party name: Public Justice
Monique Olivier
    Counsel of Record
Olivier & Schreiber LLP
475 14th Street, Suite 250
Oakland, CA 94612

monique@os-legal.com
(415) 484-0980
Party name: California Employment Lawyers’ Association, National Employment Law Project, and National Employment Lawyers’ Association
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Richard Howard Rahm
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
555 Mission Street Suite 2400
San Francisco, CA 94105

richard.rahm@us.dlapiper.com
(415) 836-2524
Party name: California Employment Law Council
Cynthia Louise Rice
    Counsel of Record
California Rural Legal Assistance, Inc.
1430 Franklin Street, Suite 103
Oakland, CA 94612

crice@crla.org
5105282653
Party name: California Rural Legal Assistance, Inc. and California Rural Legal Assistance Foundation
Janill L. Richards
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Solicitor General
1515 Clay Street, 20th Floor
P.O. Box 70550
Oakland, CA 94612

janill.richards@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3914
Party name: State of California
Todd Brian Scherwin
    Counsel of Record
Fisher & Phillips LLP
621 Captiol Mall
Suite 1400
Sacramento, CA 95814

tscherwin@fisherphillips.com
(916) 210-0400
Party name: Restaurant Law Center
Felix Shafir
    Counsel of Record
Horvitz and Levy LLP
Business Arts Plaza,
3601 West Olive Avenue, 8th Floor
Burbank, CA 91505-4681

fshafir@horvitzlevy.com
8189950800
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation and Atlantic Legal Foundation
Imre Stephen Szalai
    Counsel of Record
Loyola University New Orleans College of Law
7214 St. Charles Avenue
Box 901
New Orleans, LA 70118

iszalai@loyno.edu
504-861-5589
Party name: Arbitration Scholar Imre Stephen Szalai
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: American Association for Justice