No. 20-1570
Title:HRB Tax Group, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Derek Snarr
Docketed:May 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-17441)
   Decision Date:December 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 11, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2021 to July 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2021.
Jun 11 2021Brief amici curiae of American Bankers Association and Consumer Bankers Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Archis Ashok Parasharami
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

aparasharami@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3328
Party name: HRB Tax Group, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Derek Snarr
Other
Alan S. Kaplinsky
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
1735 Market Street – 51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

kaplinsky@ballardspahr.com
(215) 665-8500
Party name: American Bankers Association and Consumer Bankers Association