No. 20-157
Title:Edward A. Caniglia, Petitioner
v.
Robert F. Strom, et al.
Docketed:August 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1764)
   Decision Date:March 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 14, 2020 to October 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 03 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 14, 2020.
Oct 14 2020Brief of respondents Robert Strom, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2020Reply of petitioner Edward A. Caniglia filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2020Supplemental brief of respondents Robert Strom, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/13/2020.
Nov 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/20/2020.
Nov 20 2020Petition GRANTED.
Dec 02 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 08 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 8, 20201. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including February 11, 2021.
Dec 16 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Robert Strom, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 08 2021Brief of petitioner Edward A. Caniglia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2021Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Jan 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2021Brief amicus curiae of Second Amendment Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2021Amicus brief of American Association of Suicidology not accepted for filing. (January 28, 2021)
Jan 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, The Heller Foundation, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Second Amendment Law Center, Inc., California Rifle and Pistol Association, Gun Owners of California filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Project for Privacy and Surveillance Accountability and Restore the Fourth Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 15 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Suicidology filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 24, 2021.
Feb 04 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Feb 11 2021Brief of respondents Robert Strom, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 17 2021Amicus brief of The National Association of Counties, et al. not accepted for filing. (Dupilicate submission - February 25, 2021)
Feb 17 2021Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Counties, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Feb 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Iowa, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 22 2021CIRCULATED.
Mar 08 2021Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Mar 12 2021Reply of petitioner Edward A. Caniglia filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 24 2021Argued. For petitioner: Shay Dvoretzky, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Marc DeSisto, Providence, R. I.; and Morgan L. Ratner, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Edward A. Caniglia
Thomas William Lyons IIIStrauss, Factor, Laing & Lyons
One Davol Square, Suite 305
Providence, RI 02903

tlyons@straussfactor.com
4014560700
Party name: Edward A. Caniglia
Attorneys for Respondents
Marc DeSisto
    Counsel of Record
DeSisto Law
60 Ship Street
Providence, RI 02903

marc@desistolaw.com
(401) 272-4442
Party name: Robert Strom, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union et al.
Joshua Lewis Dratel
    Counsel of Record
29 Broadway
Suite 1412
New York, NY 10006

jdratel@joshuadratel.com
2127320707
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Christopher S. Gontarz
    Counsel of Record
Lynch & Pine
26 Washington Square
Newport, RI 02840

cgontarz@lynchpine.com
401 846 3306
Party name: American Association of Suicidology
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Joseph Gary Samuel Greenlee
    Counsel of Record
Firearms Policy Coalition
1215 K Street, 17th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

jgr@fpchq.org
(916) 378-5785
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition, et al.
Stephen Porter Halbrook
    Counsel of Record
Stephen P. Halbrook, PH.D.Attorney at Law
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

protell@aol.com
703-352-7276
Party name: Second Amendment Law Center, Inc., California Rifle and Pistol Association, Gun Owners of California
Melissa Ann Holyoak
    Counsel of Record
350 N. State Street,
Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114

melissaholyoak@agutah.gov
(801) 538-9600
Party name: Iowa, Louisiana, Minnesota, Montana, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Texas, and Utah
Donald E. J. Kilmer Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Donald Kilmer, P.C.
14085 Silver Ridge Road
Caldwell, ID 83607

don@dklawoffice.com
(408) 264-8489
Party name: Second Amendment Foundation
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Wake Forest University School of Law
PO Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: The National Association of Counties et al.
Michael J. Lockerby
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner LLP
Washington Harbour
3000 K Street, N.W., Suite 600
Washington, DC 20007

mlockerby@foley.com
202-945-6079
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, The Heller Foundation, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Project for Privacy and Surveillance Accountability and Restore the Fourth Inc.
Joshua Aaron Windham
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

jwindham@ij.org
7047121490
Party name: Institute for Justice
Daniel Thayer Woislaw
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd, #610
Arlington, VA 22201

dwoislaw@pacificlegal.org
6108884293
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation