No. 20-1566
Title:David Cassirer, et al., Petitioners
v.
Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation
Docketed:May 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-55616)
   Decision Date:August 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 7, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 10, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
May 14 2021Waiver of right of respondent Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation to respond filed.
Main Document
May 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/3/2021.
May 24 2021Response Requested. (Due June 23, 2021)
May 24 2021Brief amici curiae of 14 Professors of Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 23, 2021 to July 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 30, 2021.
Jul 29 2021Brief of respondent Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2021Reply of petitioners David Cassirer, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 18 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Boies
    Counsel of Record
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
333 Main Street
Armonk, NY 10504

dboies@bsfllp.com
(914) 749-8200
Party name: David Cassirer, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Erickson Andre
    Counsel of Record
Nixon Peabody LLP
300 S. Grand Avenue
41st Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

sandre@nixonpeabody.com
213-629-6076
Party name: Thyssen-Bornemisza Collection Foundation
Other
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: 14 Professors of Law