No. 20-1562
Title:Faye Strain, as Guardian of Thomas Benjamin Pratt, Petitioner
v.
Vic Regalado, et al.
Docketed:May 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-5071)
   Decision Date:October 9, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 8, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 10, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2021Motion of Armor Correctional Health Services Inc., et al. to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2021 to July 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2021.
May 20 2021Motion of Vic Regalado to extend the time to file a response from June 10, 2021 to July 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2021, for all respondents.
Jun 10 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Former Corrections Officials.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 10 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 21 Law Professors.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 06 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Virginia Sheriff's Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 12 2021Brief of respondent Vic Regalado in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2021Brief of respondents Armor Correctional Health Service, Inc.; Curtis McElroy, D.O.; Patricia Deane, L.P.N.; and Kathy Loehr, L.P.C. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Jul 27 2021Reply of petitioner Faye Strain as guardian of Thomas Benjamin Pratt filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Sep 24 2021Supplemental Brief of Faye Strain as guardian of Thomas Benjamin Pratt submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert M. Blakemore
    Counsel of Record
Smolen, Smolen & Roytman, PLLC
701 S. Cincinnati Ave.
Tulsa, OK 74119-1030

bobblakemore@ssrok.com
9185852667
Party name: Faye Strain as guardian of Thomas Benjamin Pratt
Attorneys for Respondents
Guy Anthony Fortney
    Counsel of Record
Brewster & De Angelis, P.L.L.C.
2617 East 21st Street
Tulsa, OK 74114

gfortney@brewsterlaw.com
918-742-2021
Party name: Vic Regalado
Sean Patrick Snider
    Counsel of Record
Johnson Hanan Vosler Hawthorne & Snider
9801 North Broadway Extension
Oklahoma City, OK 73114

ssnider@johnsonhanan.com
4052326100
Party name: Armor Correctional Health Service, Inc.; Curtis McElroy, D.O.; Patricia Deane, L.P.N.; and Kathy Loehr, L.P.C.
Other
Michael Francis Imprevento
    Counsel of Record
Norfolk Sheriff's Office
140 East Street
Norfolk, VA 23510

Michael.Imprevento@Norfolk-Sheriff.com
757-664-4344
Party name: The Virginia Sheriff's Association
David Massey
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
600 Brickell Ave
Suite 2700
Miami, FL 33131

david.massey@hoganlovells.com
(305) 459 6678
Party name: Former Corrections Officials
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein and Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: 21 Law Professors