No. 20-1541
Title:Pivotal Software, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Superior Court of California, City and County of San Francisco, et al.
Docketed:May 5, 2021
Linked with 20A164
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A162228)
   Decision Date:March 23, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 14, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 4, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Application (20A164) for a stay pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
May 06 2021Response to application (20A164) requested by Justice Kagan, due Wednesday, May 12, by 4 p.m. ET.
May 07 2021Waiver of right of respondents Zhung Tran, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 07 2021Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America; and the Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 11 2021Response Requested. (Due June 4, 2021)
May 12 2021Response to application from respondents Zhung Tran, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 13 2021Letter of applicants received.
May 13 2021Application (20A164) withdrawn.
Jun 02 2021Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 04 2021Brief of respondents Zhung Tran, et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2021Reply of petitioner Pivotal Software, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Deanne Elizabeth Maynard
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2100 L Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20037

dmaynard@mofo.com
202-887-8740
Party name: Pivotal Software, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Zhung Tran, et al.
Steve W. BermanHagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000
Seeattle, WA 98101

steve@hbsslaw.com
206-623-7292
Party name: Zhung Tran, et al.
Other
William Michael Regan
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
390 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10017

william.regan@hoganlovells.com
212 918 3060
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America; and the Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association