No. 20-1530
Vide 20-1531, 20-1778, 20-1780
Title:West Virginia, et al., Petitioners
v.
Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Docketed:May 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1140, 19-1165, 19-1166, 19-1173, 19-1175, 19-1176, 19-1177, 19-1179, 19-1185, 19-1186, 19-1187, 19-1188)
   Decision Date:January 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 26 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, State of West Virginia, et al.
Blanket Consent
May 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2021 to July 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2021, for all respondents.
May 28 2021Brief of respondent National Mining Association in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2021Brief of respondent Basin Electric Power Cooperative in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Commonwealth of Kentucky filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2021Brief of respondent America's Power in support filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2021 to August 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 5, 2021, for all respondents.
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 05 2021Brief of respondents States and Municipalities in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2021Reply of petitioners State of West Virginia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: State of West Virginia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: Consolidated Edison, Inc., Exelon Corporation, National Grid USA, New York Power Authority, Power Companies Climate Coalition, and Sacramento Municipal Utility District
Sean Hoe Donahue
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg & Littleton
1008 Pennsylvania Avenue, SE
Washington, DC 20003

sean@donahuegoldberg.com
2022777085
Party name: Non-Governmental Organization and Trade Association Respondents
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, et al.
Elbert Lin
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
951 E. Byrd Street
Riverfront Plaza, East Tower
Richmond, VA 23219-4074

elin@HuntonAK.com
804-788-7202
Party name: America's Power
Emily Church Schilling
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart LLP
901 K Street NW Suite 850
Washington, DC 20001

ecschilling@hollandhart.com
2023936500
Party name: Basin Electric Power Cooperative
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
227 W. Monroe St.
Suite 3900
Chicago, IL 60606

misha.tseytlin@troutman.com
(608) 999-1240
Party name: National Mining Association
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: State of New York, States and Municipalities
Steven Chiajon WuNew York Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005

steven.wu@ag.ny.gov
2124166312
Party name: State of New York
Other
Stephen Chad Meredith
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Kentucky Attorney General
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

chad.meredith@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Commonwealth of Kentucky