No. 20-1505
Title:Zainab Merchant, et al., Petitioners
v.
Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Docketed:April 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1077, 20-1081)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 28, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2021Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 28 2021Brief amici curiae of Center for Democracy & Technology, Brennan Center for Justice, and TechFreedom filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 04 2021Reply of petitioner Zainab Merchant filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Esha Bhandari
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

ebhandari@aclu.org
212-549-2500
Party name: Zainab Merchant
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Alejandro Mayorkas, et al.
Other
Trisha B. Anderson
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

tanderson@cov.com
202 662 5787
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology, Brennan Center for Justice, and TechFreedom
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center