No. 20-1492
Title:Abdulmalik Mahyoub Mulhi Abdulla, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:April 27, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1167)
   Decision Date:August 20, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 19, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 27, 2021)
Apr 19 2021Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
May 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 27, 2021 to June 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
May 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 28, 2021.
Jun 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 28, 2021 to July 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 28, 2021.
Jul 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 28, 2021 to August 27, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Jul 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 27, 2021.
Aug 27 2021Brief of respondent Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States filed.
Sep 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of the brief filed by the Acting Solicitor General for the United States on August 27, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julie A. Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Goldberg & Associates
5586 Broadway
Third Floor
Bronx, NY 10463

ecf@goldbergimmigration.com
718-432-1022
Party name: Abdulmalik Abdulla
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Attorney General of the United States, Merrick