No. 20-1486
Vide 20-1312
Title:Empire Health Foundation, for Valley Hospital Medical Center, Petitioner
v.
Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Docketed:April 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-35845, 18-35872)
   Decision Date:May 5, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 20, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 24, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel J. Hettich
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding, LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

DHettichAppeals@kslaw.com
(202) 626-9128
Party name: Empire Health Foundation, for Valley Hospital Medical Center
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health & Human Services