No. 20-1483
Title:Philip Pilevsky, et al., Petitioners
v.
Sutton 58 Associates LLC
Docketed:April 22, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of New York
   Case Numbers:(80)
   Decision Date:November 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 24, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent Sutton 58 Associates LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 26 2021Brief amici curiae of The Honorable Melanie L. Cyganowski (Ret.), et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/13/2021.
May 04 2021Response Requested. (Due June 3, 2021)
May 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 3, 2021 to July 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: Philip Pilevsky, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Ronald S. Greenberg
    Counsel of Record
Kramer, Levin, Naftalis & Frankel LLP
1177 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

rgreenberg@kramerlevin.com
12127159399
Party name: Sutton 58 Associates LLC
Other
David R. Kuney
    Counsel of Record
David Kuney Law
9200 Cambridge Manor Court
Potomac, MD 20854

davidkuney@dkuney.com
301-299-4336
Party name: The Honorable Melanie L. Cyganowski (Ret.), et al.