No. 20-1480
Title:George P. Naum, III, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-4133)
   Decision Date:October 13, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 24, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 17 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 24, 2021 to June 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 23, 2021.
Jun 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 23, 2021 to July 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 23, 2021.
Jul 23 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 12 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ronald William Chapman II
    Counsel of Record
Chapman Law Group
1441 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 310
Troy, MI 48098

rwchapman@chapmanlawgroup.com
248-644-6326
Party name: George P. Naum, III
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States