No. 20-1479
Title:Eddie Houston, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-10043)
   Decision Date:May 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 20, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 21, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 21, 2021 to June 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2021.
May 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2021 to July 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 21, 2021.
Jul 21 2021Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
2765 Sand Hill Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025

jlfisher@omm.com
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Eddie Houston, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Brianna Fuller Mircheff
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
321 E. 2nd Street
Los Angeles, CA 90012

Brianna_Mircheff@fd.org
2138944784
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers