No. 20-1474
Title:Joseph Colone, Petitioner
v.
Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al.
Docketed:April 20, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A160989)
   Decision Date:October 21, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 13, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 20, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2021Waiver of right of respondent GitHub, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 20 2021Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars and Scientists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2021Brief amici curiae of The National Association for Public Defense, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/10/2021.
Jun 07 2021Response Requested. (Due July 7, 2021)
Jun 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 7, 2021 to August 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Erwin Chemerinsky
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
215 Law Building
Berkeley, CA 94720

echemerinsky@law.berkeley.edu
510-642-6483
Party name: Joseph Colone
Attorneys for Respondents
Alexander Adelman Berengaut
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

aberengaut@cov.com
2026625367
Party name: GitHub, Inc.
Other
Samia Fam
    Counsel of Record
Public Defender Service
633 Indiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

sfam@pdsdc.org
2026281200
Party name: The National Association for Public Defense, et al.
Mary-Christine Sungaila
    Counsel of Record
Buchalter. A Professional Corporation
18400 Von Karman Avenue
Suite 800
Irvine, CA 92612

msungaila@buchalter.com
9497601121
Party name: Legal Scholars and Scientists