No. 20-1472
Title:Boechler, P.C., Petitioner
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Docketed:April 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2003)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 21, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 21, 2021 to June 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 21, 2021.
May 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Center for Taxpayer Rights filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2021Brief amici curiae of Federal Tax Clinic at Charles Widger School of Law et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 11 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 21, 2021 to July 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 22, 2021.
Jul 22 2021Brief of respondent Commissioner of Internal Revenue in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: Boechler, P.C.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Other
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Federal Tax Clinic at Charles Widger School of Law and The Seton Hall Center for Social Justice Impact Litigation Clinic
Carlton M. Smith
    Counsel of Record
Attorney at Law
255 W. 23rd Street
#4AW
New York, NY 10011

carltonsmth@aol.com
6462301776
Party name: The Center for Taxpayer Rights