No. 20-1462
Title:Eni USA Gas Marketing LLC, Petitioner
v.
Gulf LNG Energy, LLC, et al.
Docketed:April 19, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Delaware
   Case Numbers:(22, 2020)
   Decision Date:November 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 15 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 19, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021.
Jun 10 2021Response Requested. (Due July 12, 2021)
Jul 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 12, 2021 to August 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 11, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph J. LoBue
    Counsel of Record
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

JLobue@sheppardmullin.com
2027471936
Party name: Eni USA Gas Marketing LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
David A. O'Neil
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
801 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W. – Suite 500
Washington, DC 20004

daoneil@debevoise.com
(202) 383-8000
Party name: Gulf LNG Energy, LLC, et al.