No. 20-1459
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Justin Eugene Taylor
Docketed:April 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-7616)
   Decision Date:October 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 11, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 17, 2021 to May 21, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 21, 2021.
May 21 2021Brief of respondent Justin Eugene Taylor in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Justin Eugene Taylor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 07 2021Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.
Jul 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2021.
Jul 02 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jul 02 2021Petition GRANTED.
Jul 19 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner United States.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 19 2021Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 7, 20201. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 22, 2021.
Aug 23 2021Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Sep 07 2021Brief of petitioner United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 20 2021SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 7, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 4th Circuit.
Oct 04 2021Record received from the U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Virginia is electronic and located on Pacer. Some transcripts and Sealed documents has been received (One Envelope)
Oct 22 2021Brief of respondent Justin Eugene Taylor filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021CIRCULATED
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Neal Goldfarb filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of John Pangelinan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of First Amendment Clinic filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and FAMM filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2021Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 07 2021Argued. For petitioner: Rebecca Taibleson, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Michael R. Dreeben, Washington, D. C.
Jun 21 2022Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer, Sotomayor, Kagan, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., and Alito, J., filed dissenting opinions.
Jul 25 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Edwin Smiley Kneedler
    Counsel of Record
D.O.J.
10th & Constitution Ave
Washington, DC 20530

Judith.L.Reardon-Bridges@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Frances Hemsley Pratt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
1650 King Street, Suite 500
Alexandria, VA 22314

Fran_Pratt@fd.org
703-600-0815
Party name: Justin Eugene Taylor
Michael R. DreebenO’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Justin Eugene Taylor
Other
Davina Te-min Chen
    Counsel of Record
National Sentencing Resource Counsel, Federal Public and Community Defenders
321 East Second Street
Los Angeles, CA 90012

Davina_Chen@fd.org
2133933079
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders
Neal Goldfarb
    Counsel of Record
1301 Fairmont St., NW
Washington, DC 20009

goldfarbneal@gmail.com
2022627886
Party name: Neal Goldfarb
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers and FAMM
Joseph Edward Horey
    Counsel of Record
Banes Horey Berman and Miller LLC
PO Box 501969
Saipan, MP 96950

jhorey@pacificlawyers.law
(670) 234-5684
Party name: John Pangelinan
James Patrick Longest Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Duke University School of Law
Box 90360
Durham, NC 27708-0360

longest@law.duke.edu
9196137207
Party name: First Amendment Clinic