No. 20-1452 Vide 20-1284 | |
Title: | Rick C. Sasso, Petitioner v. Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | April 16, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (2019-1583) |
Decision Date: | October 14, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 14 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2021) |
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 17 2021 | Brief of respondents Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
May 25 2021 | Reply of petitioner Rick C. Sasso filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 01 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021. |
Jun 21 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
George Thomas Patton Jr. Counsel of Record | Bose, McKinney & Evans 777 6th Street, N.W. Suite 520 Washington, DC 20001 gpatton@boselaw.com | (202) 470-1944 |
Party name: Rick C. Sasso | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Paul D. Clement Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20004 paul.clement@kirkland.com | 2023895000 |
Party name: Warsaw Orthopedic, Inc., et al. |