No. 20-1440
Title:David Abrams Anaya, Petitioner
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:April 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-11203)
   Decision Date:September 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 12, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 17, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2021Waiver of right of respondent Bobby Lumpkin to respond filed.
Main Document
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adele Marie El-Khouri
    Counsel of Record
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Suite 500E
Washington, DC 20001-5369

adele.el-khouri@mto.com
202-220-1109
Party name: David Anaya
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
214-995-1838
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin