No. 20-1434
Title:Leslie Rutledge, Attorney General of Arkansas, et al., Petitioners
v.
Little Rock Family Planning Services, et al.
Docketed:April 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2690)
   Decision Date:January 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 13, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Motion of Little Rock Family Planning Services, et al. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (May 03, 2021--corrected version to be submitted)
May 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 13, 2021 to June 28, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 28, 2021.
May 11 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law & Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 13 2021Amicus brief of Americans United for Life submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2021Amicus brief of State of Missouri and 21 other states submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2021Amicus brief of The Jerome Lejeune Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2021Amicus brief of Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2021Amicus brief of United States Senators and Representatives submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2021Amicus brief of Charlotte Lozier Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2021Amicus brief of Life Legal Defense Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
501-682-6302
Party name: Leslie Rutledge, in her official capacity as Attorney General of the State of Arkansas, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kendall Kelly Alexis Turner
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

kendallturner@omm.com
7036061934
Party name: Little Rock Family Planning Services, et al.
Other
Steven Henry Aden
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

Steven.Aden@aul.org
2027414917
Party name: Americans United for Life
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: The Jerome Lejeune Foundation
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste.430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
(703) 243-9423
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: State of Missouri and 21 other states
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Charlotte Lozier Institute
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2022485407
Party name: American Center for Law & Justice
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 2105
Napa, CA 94558

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 224-6675
Party name: Life Legal Defense Foundation