No. 20-1432
Vide 20-1162
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Maine Community Health Options, et al.
Docketed:April 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2102, 2019-1633)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 13, 2021)
PetitionProof of Service
May 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 13, 2021 to May 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Maine Community Health Options, et al.