No. 20-1431 | |
Title: | Charmell Brown, Petitioner v. Alex Jones, Acting Warden |
Docketed: | April 13, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-3172) |
Decision Date: | October 21, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 17, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 09 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 13, 2021) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2021 | Waiver of right of respondent Alex Jones, Acting Warden to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
May 04 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/20/2021. |
May 24 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha Counsel of Record | Jenner and Block LLP 1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900 Washington, DC 20001 IBhabha@jenner.com | 202-637-6327 |
Party name: Charmell Brown | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Michael Marc Glick Counsel of Record | Illinois Attorney General's Office 100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor Chicago, IL 60601 Michael.Glick@illinois.gov | 3128142232 |
Party name: Alex Jones, Acting Warden |