No. 20-1429 | |
Title: | Arcona, Inc., Petitioner v. Farmacy Beauty, LLC, et al. |
Docketed: | April 13, 2021 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (19-55586) |
Decision Date: | October 1, 2020 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 9, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Apr 08 2021 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 13, 2021) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
May 13 2021 | Brief of respondents Farmacy Beauty, LLC, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jun 01 2021 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/17/2021. |
Jun 21 2021 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
R. Joseph Trojan Counsel of Record | Trojan Law Offices 9250 Wilshire Blvd., STE 325 Beverly Hills, CA 90212 trojan@trojanlawoffices.com | 3107778399 |
Party name: Arcona, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Elliot H. Scherker Counsel of Record | Greenberg Traurig, P.A. Wells Fargo Center, Suite 4400 333 S.E. 2nd Avenue Miami, FL 33131 scherkere@gtlaw.com | 305-579-0500 |
Party name: Farmacy Beauty, LLC, et al. |