No. 20-1426
Title:Epic Systems Corporation, Petitioner
v.
Tata Consultancy Services Limited, et al.
Docketed:April 12, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1528, 19-1613)
   Decision Date:November 19, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 12, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 12, 2021 to June 11, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 11, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael T. Brody
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

MBrody@jenner.com
312-923-2711
Party name: Epic Systems Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736-8270
Party name: Tata Consultancy Services Limited & Tata America International Corporation (d/b/a TCS America)