No. 20-142 | |
Title: | Michael Skidmore, as Trustee for the Randy Craig Wolfe Trust, Petitioner v. Led Zeppelin, et al. |
Docketed: | August 11, 2020 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-56057, 16-56287) |
Decision Date: | March 9, 2020 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 06 2020 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 10, 2020) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Aug 17 2020 | Waiver of right of respondent James Patrick Page, Robert Anthony Plant, John Paul Jones, Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rhino Entertainment Company, Super Hype Publishing, Inc., and Warner Music Group Corp. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 19 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020. |
Sep 10 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by California Society of Entertainment Lawyers.(Distributed) |
Main DocumentMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 10 2020 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Pullman Group, LLC, et al. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 05 2020 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The Pullman Group, LLC, et al. GRANTED. |
Oct 05 2020 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by California Society of Entertainment Lawyers GRANTED. |
Oct 05 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
Oct 30 2020 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Nov 10 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/4/2020. |
Dec 07 2020 | Rehearing DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Alfred Joseph Fluehr Counsel of Record | Francis Alexander LLC 280 N. Providence Road Suite 1, PA 19063 Aj@francisalexander.com | 2153411063 |
Party name: Skidmore, Michael | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Peter J. Anderson Counsel of Record | Davis Wright Tremaine LLP 865 S. Figueroa Street 24th Floor Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566 peteranderson@dwt.com | 213 633-6800 |
Party name: James Patrick Page, Robert Anthony Plant, John Paul Jones, Warner Chappell Music, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Rhino Entertainment Company, Super Hype Publishing, Inc., and Warner Music Group Corp. | ||
Other | ||
William Michael Hensley Counsel of Record | AlvaradoSmith, A.P.C. 1 MacArthur Place Suite 200 Santa Ana, CA 92707 mhensley@alvaradosmith.com | 949.275.4233 |
Party name: The Pullman Group, LLC, et al. | ||
Steven T. Lowe Counsel of Record | Lowe & Associates. P.C. 8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1038 Beverly Hills, CA 90211 steven@lowelaw.com | (310) 477-5811 |
Party name: California Society of Entertainment Lawyers |