No. 20-1419
Title:Reb Russell, II, Petitioner
v.
New Jersey
Docketed:April 9, 2021
Lower Ct:Superior Court of New Jersey, Appellate Division
   Case Numbers:(A-5414-18T2)
   Decision Date:June 25, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:November 6, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 10, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2021Waiver of right of respondent New Jersey to respond filed.
Main Document
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 17 2021Response Requested. (Due June 16, 2021)
Jun 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 16, 2021 to July 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 16, 2021.
Jul 15 2021Brief of respondent State of New Jersey in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 26 2021Reply of petitioner Reb Russell filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Louis Phillip Nappen
    Counsel of Record
Evan F. Nappen Attorney at Law, P.C.
21 Throckmorton Avenue
Eatontown, NJ 07724

louis@evannappen.com
7323898888
Party name: Reb Russell
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Louis Weinstein
    Counsel of Record
Hunterdon County Prosecutor's Office
65 Park Avenue
Flemmington, NJ 08822

jweinstein@co.hunterdon.nj.us
908-788-1129
Party name: State of New Jersey
Jeffrey L. WeinsteinHunterdon County Prosecutor's Office
65 Park Avenue, Second Floor
Flemington, NJ 08822

jweinstein@co.hunterdon.nj.us
908-788-1129
Party name: New Jersey