No. 20-14
Title:Congregation Rabbinical College of Tartikov, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Village of Pomona, New York, et al.
Docketed:July 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-869, 18-1062)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:February 6, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2020Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by The National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs ("COLPA"), et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 26 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Aug 27 2020Response Requested. (Due September 28, 2020)
Sep 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 28, 2020 to October 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 14 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 28, 2020.
Oct 19 2020Brief of Village of Pomona, New York, et al. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John George Stepanovich
    Counsel of Record
Stepanovich Law, PLC
618 Village Drive, Suite K
1000 Centerville Turnpike
Virginia Beach, VA 23454

john@stepanovichlaw.com
7574109696
Party name: Congregation Rabbinical College of Tartikov, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Thomas James Donlon
    Counsel of Record
Robinson & Cole, LLP
1055 Washington Boulevard
Stamford, CT 06901

tdonlon@rc.com
203-462-7549
Party name: Village of Pomona, New York, et al.
Thomas James Donlon
    Counsel of Record
Robinson & Cole, LLP
1055 Washington Boulevard
Stamford, CT 06901

tdonlon@rc.com
2034627549
Party name: Village of Pomona New York, et al
Other
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
2028281000
Party name: The National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs ("COLPA")