No. 20-1394
Title:PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Patreon, Inc., et al.
Docketed:April 6, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-1918)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:November 10, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 6, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 05 2021Waiver of right of respondents Patreon, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 06 2021Brief amicus curiae of CFL Technologies LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 25 2021Response Requested. (Due June 24, 2021)
Jun 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 24, 2021 to August 23, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 23, 2021.
Aug 23 2021Brief of respondents Patreon, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 03 2021Reply of petitioner PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
MoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
2025562010
Party name: PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
J. David Hadden
    Counsel of Record
Fenwick & West LLP
Silicon Valley Center, 801 California Street
Mountain View, CA 94041

dhadden@fenwick.com
650-335-7684
Party name: Patreon, Inc., et al.
Other
Robert P. Greenspoon
    Counsel of Record
Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC
333 N. Michigan Ave
Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60601

rpg@fg-law.com
312-551-9500
Party name: CFL Technologies LLC