No. 20-1391
Title:Sportswear, Inc., dba Prep Sportswear, Petitioner
v.
Savannah College of Art and Design, Inc.
Docketed:April 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-11258)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:February 17, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 31 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 04 2021Waiver of right of respondent Savannah College of Art and Design, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
May 11 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/27/2021.
May 12 2021Response Requested. (Due June 11, 2021)
May 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 11, 2021 to July 12, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 12, 2021.
Jul 12 2021Brief of respondent Savannah College of Art and Design, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 27 2021Reply of petitioner Sportswear, Inc., d/b/a Prep Sportswear filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Sportswear, Inc., d/b/a Prep Sportswear
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Savannah College of Art and Design, Inc.
William Andrew PequignotMoore Pequignot LLC
887 West Marietta Street NW, Suite M-102
Atlanta, GA 30318

andrew@themoorefirm.com
404-748-9596
Party name: Savannah College of Art and Design, Inc.