No. 20-1390
Title:Mario Nelson Reyes-Romero, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:April 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-3783)
   Decision Date:November 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2021)
Apr 01 2021Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filng System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Apr 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 5, 2021 to June 4, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Apr 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 4, 2021.
May 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 4, 2021 to July 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
May 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 2, 2021.
Jun 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 2, 2021 to August 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Jun 16 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 13, 2021.
Aug 13 2021Brief of respondent Merrick Garland, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Aug 31 2021Reply of petitioner Mario Nelson Reyes-Romero filed. (Distributed)
Sep 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence David Rosenberg51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

ldrosenberg@jonesday.com
202-879-7622
Party name: Mario Nelson Reyes-Romero
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Garland, Merrick