No. 20-1389 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Kaboni Savage, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:April 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-9003)
   Decision Date:August 11, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 5, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 5, 2021 to June 4, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 4, 2021.
May 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 4, 2021 to July 6, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 6, 2021.
Jun 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 6, 2021 to August 5, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 5, 2021.
Jul 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2021 to September 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 7, 2021.
Sep 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 7, 2021 to October 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 7, 2021.
Oct 07 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jonathan Podolsky Schneller
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
400 S. Hope St., 18th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

jschneller@omm.com
213-430-8115
Party name: Kaboni Savage
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America