No. 20-1381
Title:Matthew Fox, et al., Petitioners
v.
Charles A. Summers
Docketed:April 1, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Ohio
   Case Numbers:(2018-0959)
   Decision Date:December 10, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:December 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Ohio Prosecuting Attorneys Association.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Legal Momentum, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2021Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Buckeye State Sheriffs’ Association.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Brief of respondent Charles Summers in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

shay.dvoretzky@skadden.com
202-371-7370
Party name: Matthew Fox, Jeff Grey, J.K.
Elizabeth Alexandra WellOhio Crime Victim Justice Center
3976 North Hampton Drive
Powell, OH 43065

ewell@ocvjc.org
614-848-8500
Party name: Matthew Fox, Jeff Grey, J.K.
Attorneys for Respondent
H. Louis Sirkin
    Counsel of Record
600 Vine Street
Suite 2700
Cincinnati, OH 45202

hls@santenhughes.com
513-721-4450
Party name: Charles Summers
Other
Jacquenette Susanne Corgan
    Counsel of Record
Summit County Prosecutor's Office
53 University Ave.
6th Floor
Akron, OH 44308

jcorgan@prosecutor.summitoh.net
3306432800
Party name: Ohio Prosecuting Attorneys Association
Katherine Connor Ferguson
    Counsel of Record
Kooperman Mentel Ferguson Yaross Ltd.
100 South 4th Street
Suite 100
Columbus, OH 43215

kferguson@kmfylaw.com
614-344-4840
Party name: Buckeye State Sheriffs’ Association
Mary-Christine Sungaila
    Counsel of Record
Buchalter. A Professional Corporation
18400 Von Karman Avenue
Suite 800
Irvine, CA 92612

msungaila@buchalter.com
(949) 760-1121
Party name: Legal Momentum, et al.