No. 20-138
Title:Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al., Petitioners
v.
Sierra Club, et al.
Docketed:August 7, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-16102, 19-16300)
   Decision Date:June 26, 2020
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2020)
PetitionProof of Service
Sep 01 2020Letter of September 1, 2020 from the Acting Solicitor General filed.
Main Document
Sep 01 2020Motion of respondents California and New Mexico to extend the time to file a response from September 8, 2020 to September 16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 02 2020Response to motion from petitioner Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Main Document
Sep 02 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 16, 2020, for all respondents.
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Rep. Andy Barr filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Sep 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020Brief of respondents Sierra Club & Southern Border Communities Coalition in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2020Brief of respondents California and New Mexico in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 17 2020Letter waiving the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Sep 23 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.
Sep 24 2020Reply of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 13 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/16/2020.
Oct 19 2020Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Nov 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including December 8, 2020. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including January 12, 2021.
Dec 08 2020Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2020Brief of petitioners Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of The American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2020Brief amicus curiae of Rep. Andy Barr filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 31 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, February 22, 2021
Jan 06 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 12 2021Brief of respondents Sierra Club & Southern Border Communities Coalition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2021Brief of respondents States of California and New Mexico filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2021CIRCULATED
Jan 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondents.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Rio Grande Landowners Coalition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Defenders of Wildlife et al., filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of Tohono O'odham Nation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amici curiae of 87 Religious Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amici curiae of Federal Courts Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of United States House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2021CIRCULATED
Jan 25 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondents GRANTED.
Jan 25 2021Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Jan 28 2021Record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit electronic and located on Pacer.
Feb 01 2021Motion to hold further briefing in abeyance and remove the case from the February 2021 argument calendar filed by petitioners. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceOtherMain Document
Feb 03 2021Motion to hold further briefing in abeyance and remove the case from the February 2021 argument calendar GRANTED.
Apr 30 2021Letter from the Acting Solicitor General notifying the Court of the April 30, 2021, memorandum of the Deputy Secretary of Defense, filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOther

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., President of the United States, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Aimee Athena Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

Aimee.Feinberg@doj.ca.gov
916-210-6003
Party name: States of California and New Mexico
Dror Ladin
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Fundation
125 Broad Street, Fl 18
New York, NY 10004

dladin@aclu.org
2122847303
Party name: Sierra Club & Southern Border Communities Coalition
Joshua A. KleinCalifornia Department of Justice - Office of the Solicitor General
1515 Clay Street
Suite 2000
Oakland, CA 94612-1413

joshua.klein@doj.ca.gov
510-879-0756
Party name: California and New Mexico
Other
Douglas Wharton Alexander
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose et al.
Bank of America Center
515 Congress Avenue,Suite 1720
Austin, TX 78701

dalexander@adjtlaw.com
5124829300
Party name: Rio Grande Landowners Coalition
Samuel Franklin Daughety
    Counsel of Record
Dentons-US LLP
1900 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

samuel.daughety@dentons.com
202-408-6427
Party name: Tohono O'odham Nation
John Arak Freedman
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
601 Mass. Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

John.Freedman@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5316
Party name: Former Members of Congress
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Federal Courts Scholars
Dorothy Alicia Hickok
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
One Logan Square
Philadelphia, PA 19103

alicia.hickok@dbr.com
215-988-3364
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Richard Peter Hutchison
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
3100 Broadway
Suite 1200
Kansas City, MO 64111

pete.hutch@landmarklegal.org
8169315559
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Rep. Andy Barr
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel of the U.S. House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
2022259700
Party name: United States House of Representatives
Jason Craig Rylander
    Counsel of Record
Defenders of Wildlife
1130 17th Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

jrylander@defenders.org
2027723245
Party name: Defenders of Wildlife et al
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: The American Center for Law and Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Jonathan Calvin Wood
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd., Suite 610
Arlington, VA 22201-5330

jwood@pacificlegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Steven Alan Zalesin
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb and Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

sazalesin@pbwt.com
2123362000
Party name: 87 Religious Organizations