No. 20-1379
Title:Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, Petitioner
v.
Center for Investigative Reporting
Docketed:April 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1170)
   Decision Date:September 14, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:October 30, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2021 to July 2, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 2, 2021.
Apr 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Port Authority of Allegheny County filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2021Brief amici curiae of the American Public Transportation Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Greater Richmond Transit Authority filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2021Brief of respondent The Center for Investigative Reporting in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 21 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Jul 21 2021Reply of petitioner Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Maryellen Madden
    Counsel of Record
Montgomery McCracken
1735 Market Street
Philadelphia, PA 19103

mmadden@mmwr.com
2157727214
Party name: Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian M. Hauss
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

bhauss@aclu.org
(212) 549-2500
Party name: The Center for Investigative Reporting
Robert Andrew WiygulHangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

rwiygul@hangley.com
215-496-7042
Party name: The Center for Investigative Reporting
Other
Rex S. Heinke
    Counsel of Record
CALG LLP
811 Wilshire Blvd., 17th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

rex.heinke@calapplaw.com
2138780404
Party name: the American Public Transportation Association and the National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Richard Earl Hill Jr.
    Counsel of Record
City of Richmond; Office of the City Attorney
900 East Broad St
Suite 400
Richmond, VA 23219

richard.e.hill@richmondgov.com
(804) 646-7946
Party name: Greater Richmond Transit Authority
Gregory J. Krock
    Counsel of Record
MCGUIREWOODS LLP
Tower Two-Sixty
260 Forbes Avenue, Suite 1800
Pittsburgh, PA 15222-3142

gkrock@mcguirewoods.com
(412) 667-6042
Party name: Port Authority of Allegheny County