No. 20-1375
Title:Kristina Box, Commissioner, Indiana Department of Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc.
Docketed:April 1, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2428)
   Decision Date:March 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 3, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 3, 2021 to June 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part; the time is extended to and including June 2, 2021.
May 03 2021Amicus brief of Eighty-Eight Women Who Underwent Abortions as Minors and Suffered Harm not accepted for filing. (May 04, 2021 - Corrected brief to be submitted)
May 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Americans United for Life filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Eighty-Eight Women Who Underwent Abortions as Minors and Suffered Harm filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Susan B. Anthony List filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Kentucky, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Idaho, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of Charlotte Lozier Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2021Brief of respondent Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 07 2021Reply of petitioners Kristina Box, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/24/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC-South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Kristina Box, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer Ruth Sandman
    Counsel of Record
Planned Parenthood Federation of America
123 William Street
9th Floor
New York, NY 10038

jennifer.sandman@ppfa.org
2122614584
Party name: Planned Parenthood of Indiana and Kentucky, Inc.
Other
Thomas L. Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
309 West Washington Street, Suite 1250
Chicago, IL 60606

tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
3127821680
Party name: Eighty-Eight Women Who Underwent Abortions as Minors and Suffered Harm
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
440 First Street, NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20001

jbursch@adflegal.org
(616) 450-4235
Party name: Susan B. Anthony List
Meredith Leigh Di Liberto
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
501 School Street, S.W.
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20024

mdiliberto@judicialwatch.org
7574488329
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc.
Clarke David Forsythe
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Life
1150 Connecticut Ave. NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20036

clarke.forsythe@aul.org
2027414919
Party name: Americans United for Life
Stephen Chad Meredith
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Kentucky Attorney General
700 Capitol Avenue, Ste. 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

chad.meredith@ky.gov
502-696-5300
Party name: Kentucky, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Georgia, Idaho, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Charlotte Lozier Institute
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice